Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB418 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 418


 AN ACT
 relating to the compilation, maintenance, and release of
 information in a criminal street gang intelligence database by law
 enforcement agencies and criminal justice agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 61.02, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (a) Subject to Subsection (b), a criminal justice agency
 shall [may] compile criminal information into an intelligence
 database for the purpose of investigating or prosecuting the
 criminal activities of criminal combinations or criminal street
 gangs. [The information may be compiled on paper, by computer, or
 in any other useful manner.]
 (b) A law enforcement agency in a municipality with a
 population of 50,000 or more or in a county with a population of
 100,000 or more shall [may] compile and maintain in a local or
 regional intelligence database criminal information relating to a
 criminal street gang as provided by Subsection (a).  The
 information must be compiled and maintained [in a local or regional
 intelligence database only if the agency compiles and maintains the
 information] in accordance with the criminal intelligence systems
 operating policies established under 28 C.F.R. Section 23.1 et seq.
 and the submission criteria established under Subsection (c).
 (b-1)  Information described by this article may be compiled
 on paper, by computer, or in any other useful manner by a criminal
 justice agency or law enforcement agency.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a) and (c), Article 61.03, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) A criminal justice agency [that maintains criminal
 information under this chapter] may release on request [the]
 information maintained under this chapter [on request] to:
 (1) another criminal justice agency;
 (2) a court; or
 (3) a defendant in a criminal proceeding who is
 entitled to the discovery of the information under Chapter 39.
 (c) A [If a] local law enforcement agency described by
 Article 61.02(b) [compiles and maintains information under this
 chapter relating to a criminal street gang, the agency] shall send
 to the department [the] information compiled and maintained under
 this chapter [to the department].
 SECTION 3. Subsections (b) and (d), Article 61.04, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) A criminal justice agency [that maintains information
 under this chapter] may release [the] information maintained under
 this chapter to an attorney representing a child who is a party to a
 proceeding under Title 3, Family Code, if the juvenile court
 determines the information:
 (1) is material to the proceeding; and
 (2) is not privileged under law.
 (d) The [If a local law enforcement agency collects criminal
 information under this chapter relating to a criminal street gang,
 the] governing body of a [the] county or municipality served by a
 [the] law enforcement agency described by Article 61.02(b) may
 adopt a policy to notify the parent or guardian of a child of the
 agency's observations relating to the child's association with a
 criminal street gang.
 SECTION 4. Chapter 61, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 61.12 to read as follows:
 Art. 61.12.  DATABASE USER TRAINING. (a)  The department
 shall enter into a memorandum of understanding with the United
 States Department of Justice or other appropriate federal
 department or agency to provide any person in this state who enters
 information into or retrieves information from an intelligence
 database described by this chapter with training regarding the
 operating principles described by 28 C.F.R. Part 23, as those
 principles relate to an intelligence database established or
 maintained under this chapter.
 (b)  A person in this state who enters information into or
 retrieves information from an intelligence database described by
 this chapter shall complete continuing education training on the
 material described by Subsection (a) at least once for each
 continuous two-year period the person has primary responsibility
 for performing a function described by this subsection.
 (c)  The department shall adopt the rules necessary to
 implement this article.
 SECTION 5. (a) Not later than October 1, 2009, the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall adopt rules
 as required by Article 61.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added
 by this Act.
 (b) The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 shall enter into a memorandum of understanding with the United
 States Department of Justice or other appropriate federal
 department or agency, as required by Article 61.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act, not later than December 1,
 2009.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 418 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 418 passed the House on
 May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor