Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB424 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 424


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment and implementation of school-based
 influenza vaccination programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The Department of State Health Services and
 the Texas Education Agency shall conduct a joint study of
 school-based influenza vaccination programs.
 (b) The Texas Immunization Stakeholder Working Group shall
 establish within the working group a subcommittee composed of
 representatives from:
 (1) the Texas Pediatric Society;
 (2) the Texas Academy of Family Physicians;
 (3) the Texas Medical Association;
 (4) the Texas Association of School Administrators;
 (5) the Texas Association of School Boards;
 (6) the Texas School Nurses Organization; and
 (7) an entity with knowledge of best practices for the
 effective use of state and local public health resources based on
 information from other states that have implemented school-based
 influenza vaccination programs.
 (c) Members of the Texas Immunization Stakeholder Working
 Group subcommittee shall make recommendations to the Department of
 State Health Services and the Texas Education Agency regarding:
 (1) the design of the survey instrument used to
 collect data from schools with an influenza vaccination program
 under Subsection (d)(2) of this section; and
 (2) the content of the report required under
 Subsection (e) of this section.
 (d) The Department of State Health Services and the Texas
 Education Agency shall:
 (1) identify school districts in this state in which a
 school-based influenza vaccination program has been conducted on or
 after September 1, 2006;
 (2) collect relevant data related to the programs,
 including, when available:
 (A) how an influenza vaccine was purchased or
 obtained;
 (B) a comparison of how insured and uninsured
 students were managed under the program;
 (C) the costs associated with administering the
 program;
 (D) for each school year that the program was
 administered, the number of students, by grade level, that:
 (i) were vaccinated, refused the vaccine,
 or were not vaccinated; and
 (ii) were enrolled in the school district;
 (E) the number of school faculty and staff
 vaccinated;
 (F) student absentee rates during a school year
 that the school district:
 (i) administered a program; and
 (ii) did not administer a program;
 (G) the number of schools that closed due to
 influenza or influenza-like illness and the number of days that
 each school was closed;
 (H) the nature and degree of involvement in the
 implementation of a program of:
 (i) a public health department;
 (ii) other community resources; or
 (iii) private health care providers; and
 (I) whether the vaccinations were reported to the
 immunization registry maintained by the Department of State Health
 Services under Section 161.007, Health and Safety Code;
 (3) identify best practices of a school district that
 implemented a school-based influenza vaccination program; and
 (4) identify barriers encountered by a school district
 that implemented a school-based influenza program and how the
 barriers were overcome.
 (e) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department of State
 Health Services and the Texas Education Agency shall submit to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and presiding officer of each standing committee
 of the legislature with jurisdiction over the department and the
 agency a jointly written report, based on the study, that evaluates
 the feasibility of implementing an annual statewide school-based
 influenza vaccination program and that includes:
 (1) an analysis of the costs and benefits of
 implementing school-based influenza vaccination programs;
 (2) identification of barriers to implementing
 school-based influenza vaccination programs and recommendations
 for removing those barriers;
 (3) a projection of the fiscal impact of implementing
 a statewide school-based influenza vaccination program;
 (4) an analysis of the impact of the programs studied
 on private practice physicians and health care providers who
 administer influenza vaccinations in this state, based on the
 programs studied;
 (5) an analysis of the impact of a statewide
 school-based influenza vaccination program on private practice
 physicians and health care providers who administer influenza
 vaccinations in this state and recommendations for how to overcome
 any barriers; and
 (6) the role of public health departments and
 community resources in the administration of school-based
 influenza vaccination programs.
 SECTION 2. This Act expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.