E
|
05/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
E
|
05/07/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Lewis
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 186
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 186
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|