E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1064
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB1790
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 859
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
01/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|