House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 01/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |