E
|
05/30/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4976
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
Senate
|
01/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|