House | 05/23/2009 | Point of order sustained | Rule 14, Section 4 | Journal Page: 4462 |
House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1302 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 316 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 140 | |
Senate | 01/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 38 | |
Senate | 01/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |