Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 01/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |