House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4425
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4425
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1021
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Castro and Solomons
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
Rule 8, Section 5
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#979
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
18-Castro
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
7-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 4061
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3991
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3939
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3938
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3938
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3938
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
18-Castro
|
Journal Page: 3938
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
7-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 3938
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
17-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
7-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
16-Castro
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
10-Gallego and Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3931
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
10-Gallego and Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Castro
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3921
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 West
|
Journal Page: 1460
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
01/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|