Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB472 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes, Van de Putte S.B. No. 472
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 472 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice required before and period to vacate after
 foreclosure sale of real property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 24.005, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A purchaser of a property at a foreclosure sale for
 which notice was given under Section 51.002(b) shall deliver to the
 tenant not later than 24 hours after the time of the foreclosure
 sale a notice to vacate the property that states the tenant's rights
 under this chapter and Chapter 51.  The attorney general shall
 prescribe the contents of the notice.  The purchaser may require the
 tenant to vacate the property before the period prescribed by
 Section 51.002(i) only for failure to pay rent or other payment due
 under the lease agreement, including a late fee, as of the date of
 sale.
 SECTION 2. Section 51.002, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1), (d-2), (i),
 and (j) to read as follows:
 (d) Notwithstanding any agreement to the contrary, the
 mortgage servicer of the debt shall serve a debtor in default under
 a deed of trust or other contract lien on real property used as the
 debtor's residence with written notice by certified mail stating
 that the debtor is in default under the deed of trust or other
 contract lien and giving the debtor at least 45 [20] days to cure
 the default before notice of sale can be given under Subsection (b).
 The attorney general shall prescribe the contents of the notice.
 The entire calendar day on which the notice required by this
 subsection is given, regardless of the time of day at which the
 notice is given, is included in computing the 45-day [20-day]
 notice period required by this subsection, and the entire calendar
 day on which notice of sale is given under Subsection (b) is
 excluded in computing the 45-day [20-day] notice period.
 (d-1)  In addition to the notice provided by Subsection (d),
 a mortgage servicer of the debt shall serve the debtor with a
 written notice under this subsection.  The notice must be printed on
 a separate sheet of canary yellow or a similarly colored yellow
 paper that is 8-1/2 by 11 inches or larger and affixed to the notice
 of default provided under Subsection (d). The attorney general
 shall prescribe the contents of the notice. The notice must include
 the following:
 (1)  a statement that the notice provided by the
 mortgage servicer is required by law;
 (2)  a description of the process of foreclosure on a
 mortgage;
 (3)  a statement that the debtor in default has 45 days
 to cure the default as provided by Subsection (d);
 (4)  a description of the options available to the
 debtor in default to prevent the foreclosure;
 (5)  a description of resources available to the debtor
 in default to assist in preventing the foreclosure;
 (6)  a list of resources the debtor may contact for
 assistance in filing a complaint concerning the foreclosure
 process; and
 (7)  a statement that the debtor must serve a copy of
 the notice of sale on each tenant as prescribed by Section 51.0022.
 (d-2)  In addition to the notices provided under Subsections
 (d) and (d-1), the mortgage servicer of the debt shall, not later
 than the fifth day after the date the notices are mailed under
 Subsections (d) and (d-1), attempt and make every reasonable effort
 to contact the debtor in default by telephone if the debtor has
 telephone service and provide the debtor with the same information
 provided in the notices under Subsections (d) and (d-1).
 (i)  If a sale of property described by this section occurs,
 notwithstanding Chapter 24:
 (1)  the tenant of the debtor who timely pays rent is
 not required to vacate the property before the 31st day after the
 date of the sale; and
 (2)  the debtor is not required to vacate the property
 before the 14th day after the date of the sale.
 (j)  A debtor who retains possession of the property during
 the period described by Subsection (i)(2):
 (1)  may not destroy, damage, impair, allow to
 deteriorate, or commit waste on the property; and
 (2) is liable:
 (A)  to the purchaser, for the damage caused by a
 violation of Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  to the injured party, for any injury to an
 individual or damage to any property occurring during the period of
 possession described by Subsection (i)(2).
 SECTION 3. Chapter 51, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 51.0022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.0022.  NOTICE OF SALE TO TENANT. Not later than the
 seventh day after the date a debtor receives a notice of sale under
 Section 51.002(b), the debtor shall serve a copy of the notice on
 each tenant of the property by any one of the following methods:
 (1) personal delivery to the tenant;
 (2)  certified mail, return receipt requested, to the
 tenant; or
 (3)  leaving the notice inside the dwelling, as defined
 by Section 92.001, in a conspicuous place if notice in that manner
 is authorized in a written lease.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a notice required to be provided on or after September 1, 2009. A
 notice required to be provided before September 1, 2009, is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *