Senate | 04/02/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 01/14/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |