E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1080
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3476
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3476
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#383
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1989
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/27/09 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1883
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1883
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 795
|
Journal Page: 1883
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 234
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 156
|
Senate
|
02/04/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 140
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 58
|
Senate
|
01/27/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
01/14/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|