Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB497 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 497


 AN ACT
 relating to compensation paid to certain judges and justices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 26.006, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) To receive a supplement under Subsection (a), a county
 judge must file with the comptroller's judiciary section [Office of
 Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System] an affidavit
 stating that at least 40 percent of the functions that the judge
 performs are judicial functions. [The office of court
 administration shall send the affidavit to the comptroller.]
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 659.0125, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Notwithstanding Section 659.012 or any other law, a
 district judge who presides over multidistrict litigation
 involving claims for asbestos-related or silica-related injuries
 is entitled to receive, in addition to all other compensation,
 expenses, and perquisites authorized by law, the maximum amount of
 compensation set by the Texas Judicial Council for a presiding
 judge under Section 74.051(b). The annual amount must be
 apportioned over 12 equal monthly payments and be paid to the judge
 by the comptroller's judiciary section [Texas Judicial Council] for
 each month during which the judge retains jurisdiction over the
 claims.
 SECTION 3. Section 659.0445, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read
 as follows:
 (b) The monthly amount of longevity pay under this section
 to which a judge or justice described by Subsection (a) is entitled:
 (1) is equal to the product of .031 multiplied by the
 amount of the judge's or justice's current monthly state salary [$20
 for each year of service credited in the applicable retirement
 system, subject to Subsection (c)]; and
 (2) [is calculated and] becomes payable beginning with
 the month following the month in which the judge or justice
 completes 16 years of service for which credit is established in the
 applicable retirement system.
 (d)  The commissioners court of a county may provide
 longevity pay calculated in accordance with this section to a judge
 or justice described by Subsection (a) who:
 (1)  previously served as a statutory county court
 judge in the county;
 (2)  is not otherwise eligible for longevity pay under
 Subsection (b); and
 (3)  would be entitled to longevity pay under this
 section if the service credit the judge or justice earned as a
 statutory county court judge was established in the applicable
 retirement system.
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, longevity pay that is
 paid to a judge or justice under this section is not included as
 part of the judge's or justice's combined salary from state and
 county sources for purposes of the salary limitations provided by
 Section 659.012.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (c), Section 659.0445, Government
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply to
 longevity pay payable to a judge or justice after the effective date
 of this Act, regardless of the date the judge or justice first
 becomes entitled to longevity pay.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 497 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 497 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor