House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2433 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1951 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1951 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1951 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 01/22/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |