1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 52 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the penalties for the illegal use of a parking space or |
---|
6 | 6 | | area designated specifically for persons with disabilities and to |
---|
7 | 7 | | the unauthorized use of a disabled parking placard. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subsections (h), (i), (j), and (k), Section |
---|
10 | 10 | | 681.011, Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (h) If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this |
---|
12 | 12 | | section that the person has been previously convicted one time of an |
---|
13 | 13 | | offense under this section, the offense is punishable by: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) a fine of not less than $500 [$300] or more than |
---|
15 | 15 | | $800; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) 10 hours of community service [$600]. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (i) If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this |
---|
18 | 18 | | section that the person has been previously convicted two times of |
---|
19 | 19 | | an offense under this section, the offense is punishable by: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) a fine of not less than $550 [$300] or more than |
---|
21 | 21 | | $800 [$600]; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) [not less than 10 or more than] 20 hours of |
---|
23 | 23 | | community service. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (j) If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this |
---|
25 | 25 | | section that the person has been previously convicted three times |
---|
26 | 26 | | of an offense under this section, the offense is punishable by: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) a fine of not less than $800 [$500] or more than |
---|
28 | 28 | | $1,100 [$1,000]; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) 30 [not less than 20 or more than 50] hours of |
---|
30 | 30 | | community service. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (k) If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this |
---|
32 | 32 | | section that the person has been previously convicted four times of |
---|
33 | 33 | | an offense under this section, the offense is punishable by a fine |
---|
34 | 34 | | of $1,250 [$1,000] and 50 hours of community service. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. Section 681.012, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
36 | 36 | | by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) and amending Subsection (b) |
---|
37 | 37 | | to read as follows: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (a-1) A peace officer may seize a disabled parking placard |
---|
39 | 39 | | from a person who operates a vehicle on which a disabled parking |
---|
40 | 40 | | placard is displayed if the peace officer determines by inspecting |
---|
41 | 41 | | the person's driver's license or personal identification |
---|
42 | 42 | | certificate that the disabled parking placard does not contain the |
---|
43 | 43 | | first four digits of the driver's license number or personal |
---|
44 | 44 | | identification certificate number and the initials of: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) the person operating the vehicle; or |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) a person being transported by the vehicle. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (a-2) A peace officer shall submit each seized parking |
---|
48 | 48 | | placard to the department not later than the fifth day after the |
---|
49 | 49 | | seizure. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (b) On submission to the department under Subsection (a) or |
---|
51 | 51 | | (a-2), a placard is revoked. On request of the person from whom the |
---|
52 | 52 | | placard was seized, the department shall conduct a hearing and |
---|
53 | 53 | | determine whether the revocation should continue or the placard |
---|
54 | 54 | | should be returned to the person and the revocation rescinded. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
56 | 56 | | only to an offense committed on or after September 1, 2009. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (b) An offense committed before September 1, 2009, is |
---|
58 | 58 | | covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the |
---|
59 | 59 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of |
---|
60 | 60 | | this subsection, an offense was committed before September 1, 2009, |
---|
61 | 61 | | if any element of the offense was committed before that date. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
63 | 63 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
64 | 64 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
65 | 65 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 52 passed the Senate on |
---|
66 | 66 | | March 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; |
---|
67 | 67 | | May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
68 | 68 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
69 | 69 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
70 | 70 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30, |
---|
71 | 71 | | Nays 1. |
---|
72 | 72 | | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | 73 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
74 | 74 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 52 passed the House, with |
---|
75 | 75 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, |
---|
76 | 76 | | Nays 1, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
77 | 77 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
78 | 78 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
79 | 79 | | following vote: Yeas 92, Nays 50, one present not voting. |
---|
80 | 80 | | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | 81 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
82 | 82 | | Approved: |
---|
83 | 83 | | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | 84 | | Date |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Governor |
---|