House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 366
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|