E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/28/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4208 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3929 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4093 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4802 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Record vote | RV#1196 | Journal Page: 4801 |
House | 05/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4801 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4801 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4339 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4339 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3953 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |