Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB531 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 531


 AN ACT
 relating to the medical assistance program and to the billing
 coordination system for claims submitted for payment from the
 Medicaid program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 531.02413, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 268 (S.B. 10), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, is amended by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending
 Subsections (b) and (c) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If cost-effective and feasible, the commission shall
 contract to expand the Medicaid billing coordination system
 described by Subsection (a) to process claims for all other health
 care services provided through the Medicaid program in the manner
 claims for acute care services are processed by the system under
 Subsection (a). This subsection does not apply to claims for health
 care services provided through the Medicaid program if, before
 September 1, 2009, those claims were being processed by an
 alternative billing coordination system.
 (b) If cost-effective, the executive commissioner shall
 adopt rules for the purpose of enabling the system described by
 Subsection (a) to identify an entity with primary responsibility
 for paying a claim that is processed by the system under Subsection
 (a) and establish reporting requirements for any entity that may
 have a contractual responsibility to pay for the types of [acute
 care] services that are provided under the Medicaid program and the
 claims for which are processed by the system under Subsection (a).
 (c) An entity that holds a permit, license, or certificate
 of authority issued by a regulatory agency of the state must allow a
 [the] contractor under this section [Subsection (a)] access to
 databases to allow the contractor to carry out the purposes of this
 section, subject to the contractor's contract with the commission
 and rules adopted under this section, and is subject to an
 administrative penalty or other sanction as provided by the law
 applicable to the permit, license, or certificate of authority for
 a violation by the entity of a rule adopted under this section.
 SECTION 2. Section 32.024, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (ii) to read as follows:
 (ii)  The department shall provide medical assistance
 reimbursement to a pharmacist who is licensed to practice pharmacy
 in this state, is authorized to administer immunizations in
 accordance with rules adopted by the Texas State Board of Pharmacy,
 and administers an immunization to a recipient of medical
 assistance to the same extent the department provides reimbursement
 to a physician or other health care provider participating in the
 medical assistance program for the administration of that
 immunization.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0424 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0424.  REQUIREMENTS OF THIRD-PARTY HEALTH INSURERS.
 (a)  A third-party health insurer is required to provide to the
 department, on the department's request, information in a form
 prescribed by the department necessary to determine:
 (1)  the period during which an individual entitled to
 medical assistance, the individual's spouse, or the individual's
 dependents may be, or may have been, covered by coverage issued by
 the health insurer;
 (2) the nature of the coverage; and
 (3)  the name, address, and identifying number of the
 health plan under which the person may be, or may have been,
 covered.
 (b)  A third-party health insurer shall accept the state's
 right of recovery and the assignment under Section 32.033 to the
 state of any right of an individual or other entity to payment from
 the third-party health insurer for an item or service for which
 payment was made under the medical assistance program.
 (c)  A third-party health insurer shall respond to any
 inquiry by the department regarding a claim for payment for any
 health care item or service reimbursed by the department under the
 medical assistance program not later than the third anniversary of
 the date the health care item or service was provided.
 (d)  A third-party health insurer may not deny a claim
 submitted by the department or the department's designee for which
 payment was made under the medical assistance program solely on the
 basis of the date of submission of the claim, the type or format of
 the claim form, or a failure to present proper documentation at the
 point of service that is the basis of the claim, if:
 (1)  the claim is submitted by the department or the
 department's designee not later than the third anniversary of the
 date the item or service was provided; and
 (2)  any action by the department or the department's
 designee to enforce the state's rights with respect to the claim is
 commenced not later than the sixth anniversary of the date the
 department or the department's designee submits the claim.
 (e)  This section does not limit the scope or amount of
 information required by Section 32.042.
 SECTION 4. The Health and Human Services Commission may
 seek to amend an existing contract entered into under Section
 531.02413, Government Code, as added by Chapter 268 (S.B. 10), Acts
 of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, or may enter into a
 new contract, to implement the changes made to that section by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 531 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 531 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor