E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1044
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4253
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4253
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1022
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/20/09 11:30 AM
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4024
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4024
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#970
|
Journal Page: 4023
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
5-Orr
|
Journal Page: 4021
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 4021
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Christian
|
Journal Page: 4008
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4008
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Orr
|
Journal Page: 4008
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|