House
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 822
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 271
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 271
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|