House | 04/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 1205 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1205 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 997 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 316 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |