House | 05/26/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3300 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2276 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2276 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2276 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2276 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2219 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2219 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2219 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2219 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 2217 |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |