Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB543 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 543


 AN ACT
 relating to certain possessory liens; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 70.003, Property Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) A garageman with whom a motor vehicle, motorboat,
 vessel, or outboard motor is left for care has a lien on the motor
 vehicle, motorboat, vessel, or outboard motor for the amount of the
 charges for the care, including reasonable charges for towing the
 motor vehicle, motorboat, vessel, or outboard motor to the
 garageman's place of business and excluding charges for repairs.
 SECTION 2. Section 70.006, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (b-3),
 (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (a) A holder of a lien under this subchapter or Chapter 59 on
 a motor vehicle subject to Chapter 501, Transportation Code, or on a
 motorboat, vessel, or outboard motor for which a certificate of
 title is required under Subchapter B, Chapter 31, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, as amended, who retains possession of the motor
 vehicle, motorboat, vessel, or outboard motor [for 30 days after
 the day that the charges accrue] shall, not later than the 30th day
 after the date on which the charges accrue, give written notice to
 the owner and each holder of a lien recorded on the certificate of
 title. A holder of a possessory lien on a motor vehicle under
 Section 70.001, other than a person licensed as a franchised dealer
 under Chapter 2301, Occupations Code, shall file a copy of the
 notice and all information required by this section with the county
 tax assessor-collector's office in the county in which the repairs
 were made with an administrative fee of $25 payable to the county
 tax assessor-collector. If the motor vehicle, motorboat, vessel,
 or outboard motor is registered outside this state, the holder of a
 lien under this subchapter who retains possession during that
 period shall give notice to the last known registered owner and each
 lienholder of record.
 (b-1)  A holder of a possessory lien on a motor vehicle under
 Section 70.001, other than a person licensed as a franchised dealer
 under Chapter 2301, Occupations Code, who is required to give
 notice to a lienholder of record under this section must include in
 the notice:
 (1)  the physical address of the real property at which
 the repairs to the motor vehicle were made;
 (2)  the legal name of the person that holds the
 possessory lien for which the notice is required;
 (3)  the taxpayer identification number or employer
 identification number, as applicable, of the person that holds the
 possessory lien for which the notice is required; and
 (4)  a signed copy of the work order authorizing the
 repairs on the motor vehicle.
 (b-2)  If the holder of a possessory lien required to give
 notice in accordance with Subsection (b-1) does not comply with
 that subsection, a lien recorded on the certificate of title of the
 motor vehicle is superior to the possessory lienholder's lien.
 (b-3)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly
 provides false or misleading information in a notice required by
 this section. An offense under this subsection is a Class B
 misdemeanor.
 (g)  After providing notice in accordance with this section,
 a holder of a possessory lien on a motor vehicle under Section
 70.001, other than a person licensed as a franchised dealer under
 Chapter 2301, Occupations Code, shall, on request, not later than
 the 30th day after the date on which the charges accrue, make
 commercially reasonable efforts to allow an owner and each
 lienholder of record to inspect or arrange an inspection of the
 motor vehicle by a qualified professional to verify that the
 repairs were made.
 (h)  Not later than the 10th day after the date the county tax
 assessor-collector receives notice under this section, the county
 tax assessor-collector shall provide a copy of the notice to the
 owner of the motor vehicle and each holder of a lien recorded on the
 certificate of title of the motor vehicle. Except as provided by
 this subsection, the county tax assessor-collector shall provide
 the notice required by this section in the same manner as a holder
 of a lien is required to provide a notice under this section.
 SECTION 3. The Texas Transportation Commission shall adopt
 rules necessary to carry out the Texas Department of
 Transportation's duties under Sections 70.003 and 70.006, Property
 Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a possessory lien on a motor vehicle, motorboat, vessel, or
 outboard motor the possession of which is obtained on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A possessory lien on a motor vehicle,
 motorboat, vessel, or outboard motor the possession of which was
 obtained before that date is governed by the law in effect at the
 time possession was obtained, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 543 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 543 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor