House
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 271
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 271
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|