Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4579
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4579
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5996
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5996
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4437
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4437
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4437
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4437
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4428
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#943
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
4-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Dunnam
|
Journal Page: 3871
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3870
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Ortiz
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Ortiz
|
Journal Page: 3656
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3656
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Hartnett, P. King, and S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3655
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3655
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 280
|
Journal Page: 3655
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1177
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|