Senate | 04/15/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 298 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 298 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |