House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 299 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 299 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |