House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1270 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 610 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 300 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 300 | |
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |