Senate | 05/04/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Patrick | Journal Page: 1920 |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |