E
|
05/30/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4976
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#941
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2067
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1270
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
Senate
|
01/30/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|