House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 302
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 302
|
Senate
|
01/30/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|