Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB620 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R4750 TJS-D
 By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 620


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the state's goal for non-wind renewable electric
 generating capacity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 6,000 [5,000] megawatts of generating capacity
 from renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 6,880 [5,880] megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the
 commission shall establish a target of 11,000 [10,000] megawatts of
 installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. The cumulative
 installed renewable capacity in this state shall total 5,264 [2,280
 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009,
 4,264] megawatts by January 1, 2011, 6,256 [5,256] megawatts by
 January 1, 2013, and 6,880 [5,880] megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of
 the renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to
 meet the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, the
 commission shall establish a target of having at least 1,500 [500]
 megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy technology other than
 a source using wind energy by January 1, 2015.
 (o) The commission may establish an alternative compliance
 payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
 section. The commission may establish a separate alternative
 compliance payment for the goal of 1,500 [500] megawatts of
 capacity from renewable energy technologies other than wind energy.
 The alternative compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase
 requirement that could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit
 from wind energy may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater
 than $20 per credit. Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative
 compliance payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per
 credit. In implementing this subsection, the commission shall
 consider:
 (1) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 (2) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 (3) the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 (4) any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate increases.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.