Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB627 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 627
 (In the Senate - Filed February 2, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 13, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 627 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a rebuttable presumption regarding liability of an
 in-home service company or residential delivery company for
 negligent hiring.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 145.003, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b) In an action to which this section applies, an in-home
 service company or residential delivery company is rebuttably
 presumed to have not acted negligently if:
 (1) the officer or employee described by Section
 145.002 is required by state law to be licensed, registered, or
 certified by a state agency and:
 (A)  the initial licensing, registration, or
 certification process for that officer or employee, and any renewal
 requirements for the license, registration, or certification,
 authorize the state agency to obtain the officer's or employee's
 criminal history record information;
 (B)  the state agency actually obtained the
 officer's or employee's criminal history record information; and
 (C)  the state agency and the officer or employee
 have complied with the initial license, registration, or
 certification requirements and the license, registration, or
 certification; or
 (2) the company obtained criminal history record
 information regarding the officer or employee. [; and]
 (b-1) The [(2) the] criminal history record information
 required by Subsection (b) must show [shows] that, in the 20 years
 preceding the date the information was obtained for a felony or in
 the 10 years preceding the date the information was obtained for a
 misdemeanor, the officer or employee had not been convicted of:
 (1) [(A)] an offense in this state classified as:
 (A) [(i)] an offense against the person or the
 family;
 (B) [(ii)] an offense against property; or
 (C) [(iii)] public indecency; or
 (2) [(B)] an offense in another jurisdiction that
 would be classified in a category described by Subdivision (1)
 [Paragraph (A)] if the offense had occurred in this state.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 145.003, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, applies only to an
 action that accrues on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 action that accrues before the effective date of this Act is covered
 by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *