Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB627 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 627


 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of in-home service companies and
 residential delivery companies for negligent hiring.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 145.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Residence" means a person's principal or
 ordinary home or dwelling place and includes:
 (A)  any garage that is attached to the home or
 dwelling place; and
 (B)  any construction area that is attached to and
 accessible from the inhabited area or the attached garage of the
 home or dwelling place.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 145, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended by adding Section 145.0015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 145.0015.  SHORT TITLE. This chapter may be cited as
 the Sue Weaver Act.
 SECTION 3. Section 145.002, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 145.002. CRIMINAL HISTORY BACKGROUND CHECK. Before
 associating with or hiring an officer, employee, or prospective
 employee in a position whose duties include entry into another
 person's residence, an [An] in-home service company or residential
 delivery company shall:
 (1) obtain from the Department of Public Safety or a
 private vendor [approved by the department and offering services
 comparable to the services offered by the department] all criminal
 history record information relating to an officer, employee, or
 prospective employee; or
 (2)  ascertain that the person holds in good standing
 an occupational license issued by a licensing authority in this
 state that has, before issuing or renewing the license, performed a
 criminal history background check [of the company whose job duties
 require or will require entry into another person's residence].
 SECTION 4. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 145.003, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to an action against an
 in-home service company or residential delivery company that:
 (1) arises out of a criminal act or omission by an
 officer or employee of the company as to whom the company has
 obtained [is required to obtain] criminal history record
 information under Section 145.002(1) [145.002];
 (2) is brought by or on behalf of a person whose home
 the officer or employee entered while in the performance of the
 employee's job duties, without regard to where the criminal act or
 omission occurred; and
 (3) seeks damages from the company for the negligent
 hiring of the officer or employee.
 (b) In an action to which this section applies, an in-home
 service company or residential delivery company is rebuttably
 presumed to have not acted negligently if:
 (1) at the time a person was hired, the company
 obtained criminal history record information regarding the officer
 or employee under Section 145.002(1); and
 (2) the criminal history record information shows
 that, in the 20 years preceding the date the information was
 obtained for a felony or in the 10 years preceding the date the
 information was obtained for a Class A or Class B misdemeanor, the
 officer or employee had not been convicted of, or placed on deferred
 adjudication for:
 (A) an offense in this state classified as:
 (i) an offense against the person or the
 family;
 (ii) an offense against property; or
 (iii) public indecency; or
 (B) an offense in another jurisdiction that would
 be classified in a category described by Paragraph (A) if the
 offense had occurred in this state.
 SECTION 5. Subsection (b), Section 411.1181, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) An in-home service company or residential delivery
 company is entitled to obtain from the Department of Public Safety
 [or a private vendor approved by the department and offering
 services comparable to the services offered by the department]
 criminal history record information maintained by the department
 that relates to:
 (1) an officer of or person employed by the company
 whose job duties require entry into another person's residence; or
 (2) an applicant to whom an offer of employment is made
 for a position of employment with the company, the job duties of
 which require entry into another person's residence.
 SECTION 6. (a) The changes in law made by Sections 1 and 4
 of this Act to Sections 145.001 and 145.003, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, apply only to a cause of action that accrues on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A cause of action that
 accrues before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 (b) Sections 3 and 5 of this Act apply only to criminal
 history background check information obtained by an in-home service
 company or residential delivery company on or after the effective
 date of this Act. Criminal history background check information
 obtained before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 627 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 627 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor