E | 05/26/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/26/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3495 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2511 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2399 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3488 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#834 | Journal Page: 3487 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3487 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3487 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3423 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3423 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 165 | Journal Page: 3423 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2671 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2067 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2067 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2067 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |