House | 05/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1568 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1124 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1124 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1124 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1124 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 168 | |
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |