House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/18/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|