Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB644 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R4567 KKA-D
 By: Shapiro S.B. No. 644


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to modifications, adjustments, and reimbursements under
 the public school finance system for a school district located in a
 disaster area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 41, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.0931 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0931.  DISASTER REMEDIATION COSTS. (a) This
 section applies only to a district all or part of which is located
 in an area declared a disaster area by the governor under Chapter
 418, Government Code, and that incurs disaster remediation costs as
 a result of the disaster.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), for the two-year period
 following the date of the governor's initial proclamation or
 executive order declaring a state of disaster, the total amount
 required to be paid by a district for attendance credits under
 Section 41.093 is reduced by the amount of any disaster remediation
 costs paid by the district during that period.
 (b-1)  For purposes of determining the reduction under this
 section to which a district is entitled for the 2009-2010 school
 year, disaster remediation costs paid by the district after
 September 1, 2008, are included if the costs meet all other
 requirements imposed by this section. This subsection expires
 September 1, 2010.
 (c)  To receive a reduction under this section, a district
 must provide the commissioner with acceptable documentation of
 disaster remediation costs paid by the district.
 (d)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section, including rules defining "disaster
 remediation costs" for purposes of this section and specifying the
 type of documentation required under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 42, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 42.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0051.  AVERAGE DAILY ATTENDANCE FOR DISTRICTS IN
 DISASTER AREA.  (a) The commissioner shall adjust the average daily
 attendance of a school district all or part of which is located in
 an area declared a disaster area by the governor under Chapter 418,
 Government Code, if the district experiences a decline in average
 daily attendance that is reasonably attributable to the impact of
 the disaster.
 (b)  The adjustment must be sufficient to ensure that the
 district receives funding comparable to the funding that the
 district would have received if the decline in average daily
 attendance reasonably attributable to the impact of the disaster
 had not occurred.
 (c)  The commissioner shall make the adjustment required by
 this section for the two-year period following the date of the
 governor's initial proclamation or executive order declaring the
 state of disaster.
 (d)  Section 42.005(b)(2) does not apply to a district that
 receives an adjustment under this section.
 (e)  A district that receives an adjustment under this
 section may not receive any additional adjustment under Section
 42.005(d) for the decline in average daily attendance on which the
 adjustment under this section is based.
 (f)  For purposes of this title, a district's adjusted
 average daily attendance under this section is considered to be the
 district's average daily attendance as determined under Section
 42.005.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter E, Chapter 42, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 42.2523 and 42.2524 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.2523.  ADJUSTMENT FOR PROPERTY VALUE AFFECTED BY
 STATE OF DISASTER. (a) For purposes of Chapters 41 and 46 and this
 chapter, the commissioner shall adjust the taxable value of
 property of a school district all or part of which is located in an
 area declared a disaster area by the governor under Chapter 418,
 Government Code, as necessary to ensure that the district receives
 funding based as soon as possible on property values as affected by
 the disaster.
 (b)  Any additional funding to which a school district is
 entitled as a result of the adjustment required by this section is
 in addition to the amount of funding to which the district is
 entitled under Section 42.2516(b).
 (c)  A decision of the commissioner under this section is
 final and may not be appealed.
 Sec. 42.2524.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR DISASTER REMEDIATION
 COSTS. (a) This section applies only to a school district all or
 part of which is located in an area declared a disaster area by the
 governor under Chapter 418, Government Code, and that incurs
 disaster remediation costs as a result of the disaster.
 (b)  During the two-year period following the date of the
 governor's initial proclamation or executive order declaring a
 state of disaster, a district may apply to the commissioner for
 reimbursement of disaster remediation costs paid by the district
 during that period.
 (b-1)  A district may seek reimbursement of disaster
 remediation costs paid by the district on or after September 1,
 2008. This subsection expires September 1, 2011.
 (c)  The commissioner may provide reimbursement under this
 section only if the commissioner determines that the amount
 appropriated for the Foundation School Program, including the
 facilities component as provided by Chapter 46, exceeds the amount
 to which districts are entitled under this chapter and Chapter 46.
 (d)  A district seeking reimbursement under this section
 must provide the commissioner with adequate documentation of the
 costs for which the district seeks reimbursement.
 (e)  If the amount of money available for purposes of this
 section is not sufficient to reimburse each district's disaster
 remediation costs, the commissioner shall give priority to
 reimbursing costs incurred by districts that do not purchase
 attendance credits under Section 41.093.
 (f)  A district may not obtain reimbursement under this
 section for the payment of any disaster remediation costs that
 resulted in a reduction under Section 41.0931 of the district's
 cost of attendance credits.
 (g)  Amounts provided to a district under this section are in
 addition to the amount to which the district is entitled under
 Section 42.2516.
 (h)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section, including rules defining "disaster
 remediation costs" for purposes of this section and specifying the
 type of documentation required under Subsection (d).
 (i)  This section does not require the commissioner to
 provide any requested reimbursement. A decision of the
 commissioner regarding reimbursement is final and may not be
 appealed.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.