Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB65 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 65
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to leave for junior college district or university system
 employees who are physically assaulted while on duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9611.  ASSAULT LEAVE FOR EMPLOYEES OF JUNIOR COLLEGE
 DISTRICT OR UNIVERSITY SYSTEM. (a)  The definitions provided by
 Section 61.003 apply to this section.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), an employee of a
 junior college district or university system, including an employee
 of a component institution of a university system but not including
 an employee of a medical and dental unit, who is physically
 assaulted during the performance of the employee's regular duties
 is entitled to the number of days of paid leave necessary for the
 employee to recuperate from any physical injury that results from
 the assault. Notwithstanding any other law, during the period the
 employee is assigned to assault leave, the employee is entitled to
 be paid at a rate equal to the employee's regular rate of pay,
 except that the amount of pay must be reduced by the amount of any
 workers' compensation insurance benefits to which the employee is
 entitled.
 (c)  On the employee's submission of a claim for assault
 leave, the junior college district or university system, as
 applicable, shall immediately assign the employee to assault leave.
 After an investigation of the employee's claim and any
 determination that the employee was not entitled to all or part of
 the assault leave taken, the district or system may change the
 employee's assault leave status and charge the assault leave to
 which the employee was not entitled against:
 (1) any of the employee's accrued leave; or
 (2)  the employee's pay if the employee does not have
 sufficient accrued leave.
 (d)  For purposes of this section, an employee is physically
 assaulted if the conduct causing injury to the employee contains
 the elements of an assaultive offense under Section 22.01, 22.011,
 22.02, or 22.021, Penal Code.
 (e)  Leave provided under this section is in addition to any
 other leave provided to an employee under a policy adopted under
 Section 51.961 or otherwise provided to an employee. Leave taken
 under this section to which an employee is entitled may not be
 deducted from any accrued leave.
 (f)  The leave period provided by this section may not extend
 beyond the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the employee's employment with the junior
 college district or university system is suspended or ends; or
 (2) the second anniversary of the date of the assault.
 SECTION 2. Section 51.9611, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to leave based on conduct that occurs on or
 after the effective date of this Act. Leave based on conduct that
 occurs before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *