Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB654 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 654


 AN ACT
 relating to continued health coverage for employees of certain
 political subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 175, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 175. RIGHT OF [CERTAIN MUNICIPAL AND COUNTY] EMPLOYEES OF
 CERTAIN POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS TO PURCHASE CONTINUED HEALTH
 COVERAGE AT RETIREMENT
 SECTION 2. Section 175.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 175.001. APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies to a
 person who:
 (1) retires from:
 (A) county employment in a county with a
 population of 75,000 or more;
 (B)  employment by an appraisal district in a
 county with a population of 75,000 or more; or
 (C) municipal employment in a municipality with a
 population of 25,000 or more; and
 (2) is entitled to receive retirement benefits from a
 county, appraisal district, or municipal retirement plan.
 SECTION 3. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 175.002, Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person to whom this chapter applies is entitled to
 purchase continued health benefits coverage for the person and the
 person's dependents as provided by this chapter unless the person
 is eligible for group health benefits coverage through another
 employer. The coverage shall be provided under the group health
 insurance plan or group health coverage plan provided by or through
 the employing political subdivision [county or municipality] to its
 employees.
 (b) To receive continued coverage under this chapter, the
 person must inform the employing political subdivision [county or
 municipality], not later than the day on which the person retires
 from the political subdivision [county or municipality], that the
 person elects to continue coverage.
 SECTION 4. Sections 175.003 through 175.007, Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 175.003. LEVEL OF COVERAGE. (a) The person may elect
 to cover the same persons who were covered under the political
 subdivision's [county's or municipality's] group health insurance
 plan or group health coverage plan through the person at the time
 the person left [county or municipal] employment with the political
 subdivision, or the person may elect to discontinue coverage for
 one or more persons. A person who was not covered under the plan at
 the time the person to whom this chapter applies left [county or
 municipal] employment with the political subdivision is not
 eligible for coverage under this chapter.
 (b) Except as provided by Subsections (c) and (d), the level
 of coverage provided under this chapter at any given time is the
 same level of coverage provided to current employees of the
 political subdivision [county or municipality] at that time.
 (c) A political subdivision [county or municipality] may
 substitute Medicare supplement health benefits coverage as the
 coverage provided for a person who receives health benefits
 coverage under this chapter, including a dependent, after the date
 that the person becomes eligible for federal Medicare benefits.
 (d) The person may elect to continue coverage at a reduced
 level, if offered by the political subdivision [county or
 municipality].
 Sec. 175.004. PAYMENT FOR COVERAGE. A person who is
 entitled to continued coverage under this chapter is entitled to
 make payments for the coverage at the same time and to the same
 entity that payments for the coverage are made by current employees
 of the political subdivision [county or municipality].
 Sec. 175.005. DUTY TO INFORM RETIREE OF RIGHTS. A political
 subdivision [county and a municipality] shall provide written
 notice to a person to whom this chapter may apply of the person's
 rights under this chapter not later than the date the person retires
 from the political subdivision [county or municipality]. A
 political subdivision [county or municipality] may fulfill its
 requirements under this section by placing the written notice
 required by this section in a personnel manual or employee handbook
 that is available to all employees.
 Sec. 175.006. CERTAIN MATTERS NOT AFFECTED. This chapter
 does not:
 (1) prohibit a political subdivision [county or
 municipality] from uniformly changing the group health insurance
 plan or group health coverage plan provided for its employees and
 retirees;
 (2) affect the definition of a dependent or the
 eligibility requirements for a dependent under a plan;
 (3) prohibit a political subdivision [county or
 municipality] from agreeing with a person to deduct the cost of
 coverage provided under this chapter from a pension check;
 (4) prohibit a political subdivision [county or
 municipality] from agreeing with a person to pay for the coverage
 provided under this chapter provided the person reimburses the
 political subdivision [county or municipality] for the actual cost
 of the coverage;
 (5) prohibit a political subdivision [county,
 municipality,] or a pool established under Chapter 172 from
 increasing the cost of group health coverage to its employees and to
 persons covered under this chapter to reflect the increased cost,
 if any, attributable to compliance with this chapter;
 (6) affect the right of a political subdivision
 [county or municipality] to provide coverage under Chapter 172; or
 (7) affect the right of a political subdivision
 [county, municipality,] or a pool established under Chapter 172 to
 offer the coverage at the same rate that is available to active
 employees or to offer the coverage at a reasonable or actual rate
 established for retirees that may be greater than the rate offered
 to active employees.
 Sec. 175.007. EXEMPTIONS. (a) A political subdivision
 [county or municipality] that does not provide health benefits
 coverage through a self-insured plan or a plan authorized under
 Chapter 172 is not required to provide coverage under this chapter
 if the political subdivision [county or municipality] makes a good
 faith effort to purchase insurance coverage that includes coverage
 required by this chapter from an insurance company authorized to do
 business in this state and from pools established under Chapter 172
 but is unable to find a provider for the coverage.
 (b) A political subdivision [county or municipality] that
 is providing coverage substantially similar to or better than the
 coverage required by this chapter is exempt from this chapter.
 SECTION 5. Subdivision (3), Section 172.003, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3) "Political subdivision" means a county,
 municipality, special district, school district, junior college
 district, housing authority, or other political subdivision of this
 [the] state or any other state.
 SECTION 6. (a) Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies according to its terms to all eligible
 persons who leave employment with an appraisal district on or after
 January 1, 2010.
 (b) An appraisal district that is required by Chapter 175,
 Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, to provide continued
 health benefits coverage but that is not allowed to provide the
 coverage under the terms of the appraisal district's existing group
 health plan shall ensure that the required continued health
 benefits coverage is provided for in any new plan that is adopted by
 the appraisal district on or after January 1, 2010, unless the
 appraisal district is exempted under Section 175.007, Local
 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 654 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 654 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 7, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor