House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 930 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 930 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 930 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |