Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB666 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 666


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of charitable trusts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 113, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 113.029 to read as follows:
 Sec. 113.029.  RELOCATION OF ADMINISTRATION OF CHARITABLE
 TRUST. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Charitable entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 123.001.
 (2) "Charitable trust" means a trust:
 (A)  the stated purpose of which is to benefit
 only one or more charitable entities; and
 (B) that qualifies as a charitable entity.
 (3)  "Trust administration" means the grant-making
 function of the trust.
 (b)  Except as provided by this section or specifically
 authorized by the terms of a trust, the trustee of a charitable
 trust may not change the location in which the trust administration
 takes place from a location in this state to a location outside this
 state.
 (c)  If the trustee decides to change the location in which
 the trust is administered from a location in this state to a
 location outside this state, the trustee shall:
 (1) if the settlor is living and not incapacitated:
 (A)  consult the settlor concerning the selection
 of a new location for the administration of the trust; and
 (B)  submit the selection to the attorney general;
 or
 (2) if the settlor is not living or is incapacitated:
 (A) propose a new location; and
 (B) submit the proposal to the attorney general.
 (d)  The trustee may file an action in the district court or
 statutory probate court in which the trust was created seeking a
 court order authorizing the trustee to change the location in which
 the trust is administered to a location outside this state. The
 court may exercise its equitable powers to effectuate the original
 purpose of the trust.
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), the location in
 which the administration of the trust takes place may not be changed
 to a location outside this state unless:
 (1)  the charitable purposes of the trust would not be
 impaired if the trust administration is moved; and
 (2)  a district court or statutory probate court
 authorizes the relocation.
 (f)  The attorney general may bring an action to enforce the
 provisions of this section. If a trustee of a charitable trust
 fails to comply with the provisions of this section, the district
 court or statutory probate court in the county in which the trust
 administration was originally located may remove the trustee and
 appoint a new trustee. Costs of a proceeding to remove a trustee,
 including reasonable attorney's fees, may be assessed against the
 removed trustee. This provision is in addition to and does not
 supersede the provisions of Chapter 123.
 (g)  This section does not affect a trustee's authority to
 sell real estate owned by a charitable trust.
 SECTION 2. Except as otherwise provided by a will, the terms
 of a trust, or this Act, the changes in law made by this Act apply
 to:
 (1) a trust existing or created on or after September
 1, 2009;
 (2) the estate of a decedent who dies before September
 1, 2009, if the probate or administration of the estate is pending
 on or after September 1, 2009; and
 (3) the estate of a decedent who dies on or after
 September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 666 passed the Senate on
 May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays 9; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 9.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 666 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 5, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor