Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB667 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R2741 KEL-D
 By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 667


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to student Internet access to financial and academic
 information maintained by public institutions of higher education
 and to a fixed tuition rate provided by certain institutions of
 higher education to students for satisfactory academic
 performance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.973 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.973.  STUDENT INTERNET ACCESS TO FINANCIAL AND
 ACADEMIC INFORMATION. In accordance with guidelines adopted by the
 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board and to the extent the
 institution is legally authorized to provide access to relevant
 information, each institution of higher education shall provide a
 method by which each student enrolled in the institution may
 access, through the institution's Internet website:
 (1) the student's current financial status, including:
 (A)  any amount of tuition or fees the student
 owes;
 (B)  any institutional, state, federal, private,
 or other grant, loan, or other financial aid available specifically
 to the student through the institution's financial aid office,
 including the applicable amounts of aid; and
 (C)  any amount of money the student owes on a
 student financial aid loan the student received through the
 institution's financial aid office; and
 (2) the student's current academic status, including:
 (A)  a list of the courses in which the student is
 currently enrolled;
 (B)  a list of the courses that the student has
 completed at the institution or at another institution for which
 the institution has granted or will grant the student course
 credit, and the grade assigned for each course; and
 (C)  information concerning the required and
 elective courses, including the number of semester credit hours,
 that the student must complete for the student's degree plan.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.0105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.0105.  FIXED TUITION RATE FOR SATISFACTORY ACADEMIC
 PERFORMANCE. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "General academic teaching institution" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this section, in a
 semester or other academic term, the governing board of a general
 academic teaching institution may not charge an undergraduate
 student tuition under Section 54.0513, or under any other law
 granting the institution discretion to set the tuition rate, at a
 rate that exceeds the rate the institution charged the student
 during the first semester or other academic term the student
 enrolled in the institution if the student:
 (1) enrolled in the institution:
 (A) as a first-time freshman; or
 (B)  not later than the first fall semester
 following the student's graduation from high school;
 (2)  has been continuously enrolled at the institution
 since initial enrollment in the institution;
 (3)  is currently and at all times while enrolled at the
 institution has been a resident of this state for purposes of
 Subchapter B or was otherwise entitled to pay tuition at the rate
 provided for residents of this state;
 (4)  is enrolled for a full course load for an
 undergraduate student, as determined by the coordinating board, in
 a baccalaureate degree program;
 (5)  has completed at least 75 percent of the semester
 credit hours previously attempted at the institution; and
 (6)  has earned a cumulative grade point average of at
 least 2.5 on a four-point scale or the equivalent on all coursework
 previously attempted at the institution.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a student enrolled in a
 general academic teaching institution after:
 (1)  the fourth anniversary of the date the student
 first enrolls in the institution, if on that anniversary the
 student is enrolled in a four-year baccalaureate degree program; or
 (2)  the end of the standard completion period
 established by the institution for the student's degree program, if
 the student is enrolled in a baccalaureate degree program of longer
 than four years.
 (d)  Each general academic teaching institution shall notify
 each entering undergraduate student of the eligibility
 requirements for a fixed tuition rate under this section.
 (e)  In consultation with general academic teaching
 institutions, the coordinating board shall adopt any rules the
 coordinating board considers appropriate for the administration of
 this section, including rules necessary for purposes of Subsection
 (f).
 (f)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules requiring a
 general academic teaching institution to provide a fixed tuition
 rate under this section to a student who satisfies the other
 requirements of this section but, solely as a result of a hardship
 or other good cause shown as determined by board rule, is unable to
 satisfy the requirements of Subsection (b)(1), (2), (4), or (5).
 (g)  This section does not apply to a student who transfers
 from one institution of higher education to another.
 (h)  This section does not apply to a student who enters a
 general academic teaching institution for the first time before the
 2010 fall semester. This subsection expires January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall adopt guidelines as
 required by Section 51.973, Education Code, as added by this Act,
 and rules as required by Section 54.0105, Education Code, as added
 by this Act.
 (b) Not later than August 1, 2010, each public institution
 of higher education shall provide a method by which the
 institution's students may access financial and academic
 information as required by Section 51.973, Education Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.