E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4170
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4170
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4170
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4163
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#961
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Frost
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3904
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3904
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
5-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
4-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3892
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|