House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Ellis | Journal Page: 1802 |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |