House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Lucio | Journal Page: 947 |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |