House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 877
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 877
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 877
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 877
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Postponed
|
12:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 869
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 869
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 203
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 188
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|