Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB694 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R3297 KLA-D
 By: Ellis S.B. No. 694


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain reimbursements and discounts provided for
 collecting sales and use taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 151.423, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.423. REIMBURSEMENT TO TAXPAYER FOR TAX
 COLLECTIONS. Subject to Section 151.4241, a [A] taxpayer may
 deduct and withhold one-half of one percent of the amount of taxes
 due from the taxpayer on a timely return as reimbursement for the
 cost of collecting the taxes imposed by this chapter. [The
 comptroller shall provide a card with each form distributed for the
 collection of taxes under this chapter. The card may be inserted by
 the taxpayer with the tax payment to provide for contribution of all
 or part of the reimbursement provided by this section for use as
 grants under Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code. If the
 taxpayer chooses to contribute the reimbursement for the grants,
 the taxpayer shall include the amount of the reimbursement
 contribution with the tax payment. The comptroller shall transfer
 money contributed under this section for grants under Subchapter M,
 Chapter 56, Education Code, to the appropriate fund.]
 SECTION 2. Sections 151.424(a) and (c), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) Subject to Section 151.4241, a [A] taxpayer who prepays
 the taxpayer's tax liability on the basis of a reasonable estimate
 of the tax liability for a quarter in which a prepayment is made or
 for a month in which a prepayment is made may deduct and withhold
 1.25 percent of the amount of the prepayment in addition to the
 amount permitted to be deducted and withheld under Section 151.423
 [of this code]. A reasonable estimate of the tax liability must be
 at least 90 percent of the tax ultimately due or the amount of tax
 paid in the same quarter, or month, if a monthly prepayer, in the
 last preceding year. Failure to prepay a reasonable estimate of the
 tax will result in the loss of the entire prepayment discount.
 (c) A taxpayer who prepays the tax liability as permitted by
 this section must file a report when due as provided by this
 chapter. The amount of a prepayment made by a taxpayer under this
 section shall be credited against the amount of actual tax
 liability of the taxpayer as shown on the tax report of the
 taxpayer. If there is a tax liability owed by the taxpayer in
 excess of the prepayment credit, the taxpayer shall send to the
 comptroller the remaining tax liability at the time of filing the
 quarterly or monthly report. Subject to Section 151.4241, the
 [The] taxpayer is entitled to the deduction permitted under Section
 151.423 [of this code] on the amount of the remaining tax liability.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.4241 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.4241.  LIMITATION ON AMOUNTS OF REIMBURSEMENTS AND
 DISCOUNTS. (a) The sum of the amounts deducted and withheld by a
 taxpayer under Sections 151.423 and 151.424 may not exceed $10,000
 each state fiscal year.
 (b)  The comptroller shall adopt rules for determining to
 which state fiscal year amounts deducted and withheld by a taxpayer
 under Section 151.424 will be allocated for purposes of this
 section.
 SECTION 4. Section 151.801, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) Except for the amounts allocated under Subsections
 (a-1), (b), and (c), all proceeds from the collection of the taxes
 imposed by this chapter shall be deposited to the credit of the
 general revenue fund.
 (a-1)  The comptroller shall calculate the difference
 between the amount of the proceeds from the collection of the taxes
 imposed by this chapter that, in the absence of the limitation on
 reimbursements and discounts specified by Section 151.4241,
 taxpayers would deduct and withhold under Sections 151.423 and
 151.424, and the amount that taxpayers actually deduct and withhold
 under those sections after applying the limitation specified by
 Section 151.4241. The comptroller shall deposit an amount equal to
 that difference in the following order:
 (1)  an amount each state fiscal year equal to the
 greatest amount contributed by taxpayers in a single state fiscal
 year under Section 151.423, Tax Code, as that section existed on
 January 1, 2009, in the period beginning September 1, 1999, and
 ending August 31, 2009, for use as grants under Subchapter M,
 Chapter 56, Education Code, shall be deposited to an account in the
 general revenue fund and may be appropriated only to provide grants
 under that subchapter; and
 (2) the remainder as follows:
 (A)  one-half shall be deposited to the credit of
 the children's health insurance program account in the general
 revenue fund and may be appropriated only to the Health and Human
 Services Commission for the child health plan program authorized by
 Chapter 62, Health and Safety Code; and
 (B)  one-half shall be deposited to the credit of
 the medical assistance account in the general revenue fund and may
 be appropriated only to the Health and Human Services Commission
 for the medical assistance program authorized by Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code.
 SECTION 5. Section 151.423, Tax Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies to a tax report due on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A tax report due before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the tax report was due, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6. Section 151.424, Tax Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies to a prepayment of tax liability made on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A prepayment of tax liability made
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the prepayment was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.