Senate | 05/26/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 3187 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1418 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |