E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5983
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4396
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Jackson
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
02/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|